TX SB620 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Relating to the composition of the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB917 (Same As) 2021-05-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--State Employees