TX HB917 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Relating to the composition of the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-05-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-03 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-09 | House | Record vote RV#132 |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-03-31 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB620 (Same As) 2021-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--State Employees