TX SB591 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain public facilities used to provide affordable housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain public facilities used to provide affordable housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-26HousePosting rule suspended
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-05SenateFiled
2021-02-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1604 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Urban Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback