TX HB1931 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain public facilities used to provide affordable housing.
Title
Relating to certain public facilities used to provide affordable housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#300 (Y: 92 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Amended RV#283 (Y: 86 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#300 (Y: 92 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Amended RV#283 (Y: 86 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#300 |
2021-04-16 | House | Passed |
2021-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#283 |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-15 | House | Amended 1-Gates |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB591 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
SB591 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
SB591 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Housing
Housing--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Housing--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions