TX SB538 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the control of infectious diseases.
Title
Relating to the control of infectious diseases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-05-06 | House | Correction in referral |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-31 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CREMATORIES & CREMATION
Governor
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PEACE OFFICERS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Governor
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PEACE OFFICERS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF