TX SB527 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to a defendant's payment of costs associated with a court-appointed counsel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to a defendant's payment of costs associated with a court-appointed counsel.


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-25 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1849 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1095 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-25SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-22SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-22HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-21SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-21SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-19HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-19HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-15HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-15HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-15HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-15SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-15SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-15SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-15SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-10SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-08HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-04HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-04HouseRead first time
2017-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-02SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-02SenateRecord vote
2017-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-02SenateRecord vote
2017-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-27SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-02-08SenateRead first time
2017-01-19SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-02-F.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB527&RcdVtNo=1095&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB527&RcdVtNo=1849&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=37

Bill Comments