TX SB494 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to approval of certain land development applications by a municipality or county.
Title
Relating to approval of certain land development applications by a municipality or county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB866 (Same As) 2023-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
HB866 (Same As) 2023-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
HB866 (Same As) 2023-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning