TX SB493 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the idling of motor vehicles.
Title
Relating to the idling of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Fraser [R] | Rep. Wayne Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-20 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-18 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-22 | Record vote | |
2011-03-22 | Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-22 | Record vote | |
2011-03-22 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-22 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-03-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-22 | Amended | |
2011-03-22 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-22 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-16 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-15 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time | |
2011-02-01 | Filed | |
2011-02-01 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PICKUP & HEAVY TRUCKS
VEHICLE WEIGHT LIMITS & ENFORCEMENT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PICKUP & HEAVY TRUCKS
VEHICLE WEIGHT LIMITS & ENFORCEMENT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General