TX SB48 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to conditions of community supervision for defendants convicted of certain criminal offenses involving animals.
Title
Relating to conditions of community supervision for defendants convicted of certain criminal offenses involving animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1381 (Y: 126 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1381 |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2021-04-14 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB91 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Corrections
Subjects
Animals
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION