TX SB437 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to affirmative defenses to prosecution for certain offenses involving material or conduct that is obscene or otherwise harmful to children.
Title
Relating to affirmative defenses to prosecution for certain offenses involving material or conduct that is obscene or otherwise harmful to children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB111 (Same As) 2023-02-23 - Referred to State Affairs
HB976 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to State Affairs
HB111 (Same As) 2023-02-23 - Referred to State Affairs
HB976 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to State Affairs
HB111 (Same As) 2023-02-23 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB437 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00437I.htm |