TX HB111 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to affirmative defenses to prosecution for certain offenses involving material or conduct that is obscene or otherwise harmful to children.
Title
Relating to affirmative defenses to prosecution for certain offenses involving material or conduct that is obscene or otherwise harmful to children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB976 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to State Affairs
HB976 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to State Affairs
SB437 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB437 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB976 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to State Affairs
SB437 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB437 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB111 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB00111I.htm |