TX SB390 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the date of dissolution of the Save Historic Muny District.
Title
Relating to the date of dissolution of the Save Historic Muny District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Effective immediately | |
2021-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 681 |
2021-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB681 (Same As) 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
SAVE HISTORIC MUNY DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous