TX SB386 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Referred to House Administration
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Referred to House Administration
Summary
Relating to the administrative fine and the late payment fee for a violation of a parking rule applicable to the Capitol Complex.
Title
Relating to the administrative fine and the late payment fee for a violation of a parking rule applicable to the Capitol Complex.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Referred to House Administration | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-06 | Record vote | |
2009-04-06 | Passed | |
2009-04-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-06 | Record vote | |
2009-04-06 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-06 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-06 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-31 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Administration | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-12-19 | Filed | |
2008-12-19 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
PARKING
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General