TX SB348 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the Texas Transportation Commission's authority to establish advisory committees.
Title
Relating to the Texas Transportation Commission's authority to establish advisory committees.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Joe Pickett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-22 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-11 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-03-19 | Record vote | |
2009-03-19 | Passed | |
2009-03-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-19 | Record vote | |
2009-03-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-03-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-03-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-03-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-02 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-02-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-02-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2008-12-09 | Filed | |
2008-12-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
Transportation--Miscellaneous