TX SB315 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of organized criminal activity involving the interception, use, or disclosure of certain communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of organized criminal activity involving the interception, use, or disclosure of certain communications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-07SenateFiled
2019-01-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB869 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback