TX SB295 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the unlawful restraint of a dog; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the unlawful restraint of a dog; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseReturned to committee
2019-05-20HousePoint of order sustained Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-10SenateRecord vote
2019-04-10SenatePassed
2019-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-10SenateRecord vote
2019-04-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-03SenateFiled
2019-01-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB940 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback