TX SB2231 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption of tuition and laboratory fees at public institutions of higher education for certain paramedics.
Title
Relating to the exemption of tuition and laboratory fees at public institutions of higher education for certain paramedics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3890 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
DISTANCE EDUCATION
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS