TX HB3890 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption of tuition and laboratory fees at public institutions of higher education for certain paramedics.
Title
Relating to the exemption of tuition and laboratory fees at public institutions of higher education for certain paramedics.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Steve Toth [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2231 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel