TX SB220 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to notice and reporting requirements for vendor rebates under a contract listed on a multiple award contract schedule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to notice and reporting requirements for vendor rebates under a contract listed on a multiple award contract schedule.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1360 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1360
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-15HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-15HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenatePassed
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-30SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29SenateMeeting cancelled
2021-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-30SenateFiled
2020-11-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB220
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00220I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00220S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00220E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00220H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00220F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00220I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00220I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00220H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00220F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB220&RcdVtNo=1360&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021

Bill Comments

feedback