TX SB220 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to guardianships, including the assessment of prospective wards for, and the provision of, guardianship services by the Department of Aging and Disability Services.
Title
Relating to guardianships, including the assessment of prospective wards for, and the provision of, guardianship services by the Department of Aging and Disability Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-26 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-25 | Read | |
2011-05-25 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-17 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Human Services | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-20 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-20 | Record vote | |
2011-04-20 | Passed | |
2011-04-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-20 | Record vote | |
2011-04-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-20 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-18 | Filed | |
2010-11-18 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Aging
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Disabilities, Persons with
GUARDIANS & WARDS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Protection of Personal Information
VOLUNTEERS
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Disabilities, Persons with
GUARDIANS & WARDS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Protection of Personal Information
VOLUNTEERS