TX SB2105 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirement that the Texas Workforce Commission provide certain employment information for secondary school students.
Title
Relating to the requirement that the Texas Workforce Commission provide certain employment information for secondary school students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#982 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-08 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2017-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS