TX SB2091 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the procedures and grounds for terminating the parent-child relationship, for taking possession of a child, and for certain hearings in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the procedures and grounds for terminating the parent-child relationship, for taking possession of a child, and for certain hearings in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3331 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback