TX HB3331 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the procedures and grounds for terminating the parent-child relationship, for taking possession of a child, and for certain hearings in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the procedures and grounds for terminating the parent-child relationship, for taking possession of a child, and for certain hearings in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2091 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Committee report printed and distributed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback