TX SB2084 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to calculation of average daily attendance for public school students in blended learning programs.
Title
Relating to calculation of average daily attendance for public school students in blended learning programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DISTANCE EDUCATION
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development