TX SB2039 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the development and use of instructional modules and training for public schools on the prevention of sexual abuse and sex trafficking and participation by the human trafficking prevention task force in that development.
Title
Relating to the development and use of instructional modules and training for public schools on the prevention of sexual abuse and sex trafficking and participation by the human trafficking prevention task force in that development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Passed to engrossment as amended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Passed to engrossment as amended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | See remarks for effective date | |
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL ABUSE
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL ABUSE