TX SB2037 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Postponed 11/13/23 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Postponed 11/13/23 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of platting and subdivisions of land by a municipality or county.
Title
Relating to the regulation of platting and subdivisions of land by a municipality or county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Postponed 11/13/23 10:00 AM |
2023-05-23 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section, 32(c)(1) |
2023-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-05 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2023-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4991 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Land & Resource Management
HB4991 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Land & Resource Management
HB4991 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Land & Resource Management
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
PLATTING
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
PLATTING