TX SB197 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-11)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . October 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a sales and use tax exemption for animals adopted from or sold by nonprofit animal welfare organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a sales and use tax exemption for animals adopted from or sold by nonprofit animal welfare organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1257 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . October 1, 2021
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-19HouseRecord vote RV#1257
2021-05-19HousePassed
2021-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-18HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-04-14HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenatePassed
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-30SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29SenateMeeting cancelled
2021-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2021-03-02SenateCo-author authorized
2020-11-16SenateFiled
2020-11-16SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2510 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - Referred to Finance

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB197
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00197I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00197S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00197E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00197H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00197F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00197I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00197I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00197H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00197F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB197&RcdVtNo=1257&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback