TX SB190 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administrative closure of certain reported cases of child abuse or neglect made to the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to the administrative closure of certain reported cases of child abuse or neglect made to the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Amended RV#1370 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Amended RV#1370 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-19 | House | Amended |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-18 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety