TX SB1873 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-35)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a report regarding certain health and safety information prepared by the Texas Education Agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a report regarding certain health and safety information prepared by the Texas Education Agency.

Sponsors

Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Diana Arevalo [D]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Byron Cook [R]
Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]
Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]
Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]
Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]
Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Eric Johnson [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]
Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Joe Pickett [D]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Tomas Uresti [D]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. Armando Walle [D]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]
Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1542 (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HousePassed
2017-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-21HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-16HouseNo action taken in committee
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-15HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-09SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenatePassed
2017-05-09SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback