TX SB1857 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the certification of certain qualified handgun instructors to conduct school safety training.
Title
Relating to the certification of certain qualified handgun instructors to conduct school safety training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-17 - House - SB 1857Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2013-04-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |