TX SB1822 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to Redistricting
Pending: House Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to dates of certain elections to be held in 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to dates of certain elections to be held in 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseReferred to Redistricting
2021-04-13HouseRead first time
2021-04-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-08SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenatePassed
2021-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08SenateAmended
2021-04-08SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Johnson
2021-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08SenateAmended
2021-04-08SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2021-04-08SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1822
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01822I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01822S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01822E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01822S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01822S2F2.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01822I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01822I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01822S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01822S.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-08-F.PDF#page=30

Bill Comments 750

feedback