TX SB18 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 71-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the protection of expressive activities at public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the protection of expressive activities at public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors

Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]
Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]Sen. Pat Fallon [R]Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]
Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]
Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]
Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. John Wray [R]
Rep. William Zedler [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1930 (Y: 106 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1504 (Y: 86 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - RV#1503 (Y: 80 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - RV#1502 (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - RV#1501 (Y: 78 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-25SenateRecord vote
2019-05-25SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1930
2019-05-25HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-24HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-23SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-22SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-22SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-22HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-22HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-20HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-20HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-20HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-20SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-20SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-20SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-20SenateRead
2019-05-20SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-19SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1508
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1507
2019-05-17HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2019-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1504
2019-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1503
2019-05-17HouseAmended 3-Cain
2019-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1502
2019-05-17HouseAmended 2-Cain
2019-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1501
2019-05-17HouseAmended 1-Cain
2019-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-28HouseRead first time
2019-03-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-20SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-20SenateRecord vote
2019-03-20SenatePassed
2019-03-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-20SenateRecord vote
2019-03-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-18SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-03-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-25SenateFiled
2019-02-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3395 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB18
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00018I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00018S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00018E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00018H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00018F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ03-20-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ03-20-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB18&RcdVtNo=1501&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB18&RcdVtNo=1502&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB18&RcdVtNo=1503&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB18&RcdVtNo=1504&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB18&RcdVtNo=1507&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB18&RcdVtNo=1508&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB18&RcdVtNo=1930&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=85

Bill Comments

feedback