TX HB3395 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the protection of expressive activities at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the protection of expressive activities at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB18 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3395 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03395I.htm |