TX SB1771 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of property owned by certain electric cooperatives.
Title
Relating to the appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of property owned by certain electric cooperatives.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4130 (Same As) 2023-04-17 - Left pending in committee
HB4130 (Same As) 2023-04-17 - Left pending in committee
HB4130 (Same As) 2023-04-17 - Left pending in committee