TX SB1760 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Summary
Relating to the administration of the Texas Save and Match Program to assist qualifying beneficiaries under the state's prepaid tuition plans and college savings plans and to the treatment of a beneficiary's assets under prepaid tuition plans and college savings plans in determining eligibility for student financial assistance and other assistance programs.
Title
Relating to the administration of the Texas Save and Match Program to assist qualifying beneficiaries under the state's prepaid tuition plans and college savings plans and to the treatment of a beneficiary's assets under prepaid tuition plans and college savings plans in determining eligibility for student financial assistance and other assistance programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-24 | Amended | |
2009-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-13 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-04-30 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |