TX SB1743 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to transferring the Office for the Prevention of Developmental Disabilities to The University of Texas at Austin and renaming the office the Office for Healthy Children.
Title
Relating to transferring the Office for the Prevention of Developmental Disabilities to The University of Texas at Austin and renaming the office the Office for Healthy Children.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. James White [R] |
Rep. Donna Howard [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1474 (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1438 (Y: 68 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Passed (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1438 (Y: 68 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Passed (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Passed |
2017-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Human Services
Human Services--General
OFFICE FOR HEALTHY CHILDREN
OFFICE FOR THE PREVENTION OF DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Human Services
Human Services--General
OFFICE FOR HEALTHY CHILDREN
OFFICE FOR THE PREVENTION OF DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN