TX SB1736 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to the regulation of certain water wells by the Presidio County Underground Water Conservation District.
Title
Relating to the regulation of certain water wells by the Presidio County Underground Water Conservation District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB809 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
Subjects
PRESIDIO COUNTY UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.