TX SB1731 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain eligibility requirements for issuance of a teaching certificate.
Title
Relating to certain eligibility requirements for issuance of a teaching certificate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3217 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR