TX SB1729 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an agreement between the Department of Public Safety and a county for the provision of renewal and duplicate driver's license and other identification certificate services; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to an agreement between the Department of Public Safety and a county for the provision of renewal and duplicate driver's license and other identification certificate services; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Nichols [R] | Sen. Robert Duncan [R] | Sen. Kenneth Paxton [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - SB 1729Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 1 by Cook (Y: 72 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 1 by Cook (Y: 72 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed |
2013-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-17 | House | Point of order sustained (amendment) |
2013-05-17 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-17 | House | Amended |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2013-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
County Government--General
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses