TX SB1711 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-28 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-28 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the protection of expressive activities at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the protection of expressive activities at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-04-28 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |