TX SB168 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to emergency school drills and exercises conducted by public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to emergency school drills and exercises conducted by public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective immediately
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-11HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-07HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-05-07HouseRead first time
2021-05-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-06SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-06SenateRecord vote
2021-05-06SenatePassed
2021-05-06SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-06SenateRecord vote
2021-05-06SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-06SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-06SenateAmended
2021-05-06SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell
2021-05-06SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-06SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-22SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-10SenateFiled
2020-11-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1016 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB168
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00168I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00168S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00168E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00168H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00168F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00168S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00168I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00168I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00168S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00168S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00168H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00168F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-06-F.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB168&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021

Bill Comments

feedback