TX HB1016 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to emergency school drills and exercises conducted by public schools.
Title
Relating to emergency school drills and exercises conducted by public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB168 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Weapons
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Weapons