TX SB1665 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the investment authority of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the investment authority of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1765 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1708 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-15HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Pensions
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-22SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-22SenateRead first time
2017-03-09SenateFiled
2017-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1665
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01665I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01665S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01665E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01665H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01665F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1665&RcdVtNo=1708&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1665&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1665&RcdVtNo=1765&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017

Bill Comments

feedback