TX SB1641 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Ports, Select Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Ports, Select Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the port commission of the Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas.
Title
Relating to the composition of the port commission of the Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ports, Select |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4137 (Same As) 2021-04-09 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Subjects
CORPUS CHRISTI, CITY OF
PORT OF CORPUS CHRISTI AUTHORITY OF NUECES COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
PORT OF CORPUS CHRISTI AUTHORITY OF NUECES COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1641 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01641I.htm |