TX SB1631 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the child safety zone applicable to a person released on parole or to mandatory supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the child safety zone applicable to a person released on parole or to mandatory supervision.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-04SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-22SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-03-22SenateRead first time
2017-03-09SenateFiled
2017-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback