TX SB1579 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures under the public information law, including expedited responses and charges for bad faith requests.
Title
Relating to procedures under the public information law, including expedited responses and charges for bad faith requests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-05-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |