TX SB1560 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Referred to Higher Education
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Referred to Higher Education
Summary
Relating to university funding, including university funding for excellence, the national research university fund, the abolition of the higher education fund, and the institutional groupings established by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.
Title
Relating to university funding, including university funding for excellence, the national research university fund, the abolition of the higher education fund, and the institutional groupings established by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-01 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Amended | |
2009-04-30 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Amendment tabled | |
2009-04-30 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Amended | |
2009-04-30 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Amendment tabled | |
2009-04-30 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-30 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-29 | Postponed | |
2009-04-29 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-29 | Amended | |
2009-04-29 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-29 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-29 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-27 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-15 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-08 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed | |
2009-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4453 (Same As) 2009-03-25 - Referred to Higher Education
SJR35 (Enabling for) 2009-05-24 - Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
SJR35 (Enabling for) 2009-05-24 - Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS