TX SB1507 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the statewide coordination and oversight of forensic mental health services overseen by the Department of State Health Services, including the appointment of a forensic director.
Title
Relating to the statewide coordination and oversight of forensic mental health services overseen by the Department of State Health Services, including the appointment of a forensic director.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - House - SB 1507Third Reading House (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Effective immediately | |
2015-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-18 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-18 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-11 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-08 | House | Amended |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CIVIL COMMITMENT
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Insanity Defense
FORENSIC TESTING
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MENTAL INCOMPETENCY
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Science & Technology
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Insanity Defense
FORENSIC TESTING
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MENTAL INCOMPETENCY
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Science & Technology
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF