TX SB15 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-7)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-7)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to virtual and off-campus electronic instruction at a public school, the satisfaction of teacher certification requirements through an internship teaching certain virtual courses, and the allotment for certain special-purpose school districts under the Foundation School Program.
Title
Relating to virtual and off-campus electronic instruction at a public school, the satisfaction of teacher certification requirements through an internship teaching certain virtual courses, and the allotment for certain special-purpose school districts under the Foundation School Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Sen. Angela Paxton [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Keith Bell [R] | Rep. Dan Huberty [R] |
Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] |
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] |
Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Harold Dutton [D] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Justin Holland [R] |
Rep. Ann Johnson [D] | Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
Rep. Eddie Morales [D] | Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] |
Rep. Jared Patterson [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. John Raney [R] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] |
Rep. Reggie Smith [R] | Rep. David Spiller [R] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] |
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Rep. James Talarico [D] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
Rep. James White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-31 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#96 (Y: 119 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-08-27 - House - Amended RV#88 (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-08-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#87 (Y: 40 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#96 (Y: 119 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-08-27 - House - Amended RV#88 (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-08-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#87 (Y: 40 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-09 | Effective immediately | |
2021-09-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-09-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-09-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-09-01 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Read |
2021-08-31 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-08-30 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-08-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-30 | House | Record vote RV#96 |
2021-08-30 | House | Passed |
2021-08-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-08-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-27 | House | Record vote RV#88 |
2021-08-27 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-08-27 | House | Amended 6-Huberty and K. Bell |
2021-08-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-27 | House | Record vote RV#87 |
2021-08-27 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 5-J. Turner |
2021-08-27 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 4-M. González |
2021-08-27 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 3-M. González |
2021-08-27 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 1-K. Bell |
2021-08-27 | House | Amendment amended 2-K. Bell |
2021-08-27 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-K. Bell |
2021-08-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-08-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-08-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-08-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-08-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-08-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-08-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-08-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-08-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-08-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-08-19 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-08-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-08-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Passed |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Amended |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Hughes |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Amended |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Taylor |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Amended |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Ordered not printed |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Printing rule suspended |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Filed |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB30 (Similar To) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Public Education
HB30 (Similar To) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Public Education
HB172 (Similar To) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Public Education
HB30 (Similar To) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Public Education
HB172 (Similar To) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
DISTANCE EDUCATION
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR