TX SB1489 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of information regarding COVID-19 prevention and treatment to individuals receiving a COVID-19 viral test.
Title
Relating to the provision of information regarding COVID-19 prevention and treatment to individuals receiving a COVID-19 viral test.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COVID-19
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF